OH HB193 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on January 22 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-01-23 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3301.079, 3301.0710, 3301.0711, 3301.0712, 3301.16, 3302.02, 3302.03, 3302.031, 3310.14, 3310.522, 3313.532, 3313.603, 3313.61, 3313.611, 3313.612, 3313.614, 3313.615, 3313.976, 3314.017, 3314.03, 3314.36, 3325.08, 3326.11, 3328.24, 3328.25, 3329.07, 3329.08, and 3333.123 and to enact sections 3301.946, 3302.036, 3313.618, 3314.019, 3329.081, and 3329.082 of the Revised Code with respect to state academic achievement assessments and high school graduation requirements; to amend the version of section 3326.11 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect July 1, 2014, to continue the provisions of this act on or after that effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

That is scheduled to take effect July 1, 2014, to continue the provisions of this act on or after that effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-22 - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-23 To Education
2014-01-23 Introduced to Senate
2014-01-22 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2013-12-11 Committee Report - S
2013-06-04 To Education
2013-06-04 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3301Amended CodeCitation Text
33010710Amended CodeCitation Text
33010711Amended CodeCitation Text
33010712Amended CodeCitation Text
3301079Amended CodeCitation Text
330116Amended CodeCitation Text
3301946New CodeSee Bill Text
3302Amended CodeCitation Text
330202Amended CodeCitation Text
330203Amended CodeCitation Text
3302031Amended CodeCitation Text
3302036New CodeSee Bill Text
3310Amended CodeCitation Text
331014Amended CodeCitation Text
3310522Amended CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
3313532Amended CodeCitation Text
3313603Amended CodeCitation Text
331361Amended CodeCitation Text
3313611Amended CodeCitation Text
3313612Amended CodeCitation Text
3313614Amended CodeCitation Text
3313615Amended CodeCitation Text
3313618New CodeSee Bill Text
3313976Amended CodeCitation Text
3314Amended CodeCitation Text
3314017Amended CodeCitation Text
3314019New CodeSee Bill Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
331436Amended CodeCitation Text
3325Amended CodeCitation Text
332508Amended CodeCitation Text
3326Amended CodeCitation Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text
3328Amended CodeCitation Text
332824Amended CodeCitation Text
332825Amended CodeCitation Text
3329Amended CodeCitation Text
332907Amended CodeCitation Text
332908Amended CodeCitation Text
3329081New CodeSee Bill Text
3329082New CodeSee Bill Text
3333Amended CodeCitation Text
3333123Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback