OH HB175 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on November 18 2009 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Committee Report - S
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 109.73, 317.08, 959.131, 1717.01, 1717.04, 1717.06, and 1717.09 of the Revised Code to require a person to file proof of successful completion of training with the county recorder prior to being appointed as a humane society agent and to require the revocation of an appointment under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require a person to file proof of successful completion of training with the county recorder prior to being appointed as a humane society agent and to require the revocation of an appointment under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-19 Committee Report - S
2009-11-19 To Agriculture
2009-11-19 Introduced to Senate
2009-11-18 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-10-14 Committee Report - S
2009-05-12 To Local Government/Public Administration
2009-05-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
10973Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1717Amended CodeCitation Text
171701Amended CodeCitation Text
171704Amended CodeCitation Text
171706Amended CodeCitation Text
171709Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
317Amended CodeCitation Text
31708Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
959Amended CodeCitation Text
959131Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback