OH HB15 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progress
Action: 2009-06-30 - Effective Date

Summary


Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title


Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-30 Effective Date
2009-06-30 Governor' Action
2009-07-11 End of 10-day period
2009-06-30 Sent to Governor
2009-06-30 Concurrence
2009-06-24 Conference Committee
2009-06-17 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2009-06-17 Committee Report - Substitute
2009-03-25 To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
2009-03-25 Introduced to Senate
2009-03-24 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-03-24 Committee Report
2009-02-17 To *Finance & Appropriations
2009-02-17 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
12152Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4121Amended CodeCitation Text
412112Amended CodeCitation Text
4121125Amended CodeCitation Text
412162Amended CodeCitation Text
412170Amended CodeCitation Text
412175Amended CodeCitation Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
412329Amended CodeCitation Text
412334Amended CodeCitation Text
412335Amended CodeCitation Text
412382Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback