OH HB133 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 123.01, 1531.06, 1531.33, and 3345.181, to enact sections 131.50, 1503.012, 1509.70, 1509.71, 1509.72, 1509.73, 1509.74, 1509.75, 1509.76, 1509.77, 1509.78, and 1541.26, and to repeal sections 5119.40, 5120.12, and 5123.23 of the Revised Code to create the Oil and Gas Leasing Commission, to establish a procedure for leasing land owned or under the control of state agencies for oil and gas production in order to provide funding for capital costs for the agencies, and to exclude nature preserves from drilling.
Title
To create the Oil and Gas Leasing Commission, to establish a procedure for leasing land owned or under the control of state agencies for oil and gas production in order to provide funding for capital costs for the agencies, and to exclude nature preserves from drilling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-30 | Effective Date | |
2011-06-30 | Governor' Action | |
2011-07-06 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-06-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-06-21 | Concurrence | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-06-15 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-05-26 | To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources | |
2011-05-26 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-24 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-03-01 | To Agriculture & Natural Resources | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 23 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 31 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
15 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 03 | 012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 05 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 09 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 09 | 71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 09 | 72 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 09 | 73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 09 | 74 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 09 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 09 | 76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 09 | 77 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 09 | 78 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 31 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 31 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 41 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 45 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | Repealed Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 19 | Repealed Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 19 | 40 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
51 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 20 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
51 | 23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 23 | 23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |