OH HB123 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-04-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 145.27, 145.56, 145.561, 145.82, 145.95, 742.41, 742.46, 742.47, 742.64, 2329.66, 2929.192, 3305.07, 3305.08, 3305.20, 3305.22, 3307.20, 3307.41, 3307.42, 3309.22, 3309.66, 3309.661, 3309.82, 3309.95, 4121.12, 4121.123, 4121.125, 4121.32, 4121.41, 4121.44, 4121.68, 4123.35, 4123.512, 4123.52, 5505.04, 5505.22, and 5505.34; to enact sections 145.573, 742.464, 2929.193, 3305.12, 3307.373, 3309.673, and 5505.263; and to repeal sections 4121.124 and 4121.99 of the Revised Code to allow the Administrator of Workers' Compensation to waive criteria certain public employers must satisfy to become self-insuring employers; to require bills for medical and vocational rehabilitation services in claims that are ultimately denied to be paid from the Surplus Fund Account under specified circumstances; to make other changes to the Workers' Compensation Law; to provide for termination of the disability benefit of a state retirement system member convicted of certain felonies committed while serving in a position of honor, trust, or profit; to make appropriations for the Bureau of Workers' Compensation and for the Workers' Compensation Council for the biennium beginning July 1, 2011, and ending June 30, 2013; and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of the Bureau's and the Council's programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To allow the Administrator of Workers' Compensation to waive criteria certain public employers must satisfy to become self-insuring employers; to require bills for medical and vocational rehabilitation services in claims that are ultimately denied to be paid from the Surplus Fund Account under specified circumstances; to make other changes to the Workers' Compensation Law; to provide for termination of the disability benefit of a state retirement system member convicted of certain felonies committed while serving in a position of honor, trust, or profit; to make appropriations for the Bureau of Workers' Compensation and for the Workers' Compensation Council for the biennium beginning July 1, 2011, and ending June 30, 2013; and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of the Bureau's and the Council's programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-13 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-25 Effective Date
2011-04-25 Governor' Action
2011-04-13 Concurrence
2011-04-06 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-04-06 Committee Report - S
2011-03-24 To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
2011-03-24 Introduced to Senate
2011-03-23 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-03-22 Committee Report
2011-02-24 To *Finance & Appropriations
2011-02-24 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
145Amended CodeCitation Text
14527Amended CodeCitation Text
14556Amended CodeCitation Text
145561Amended CodeCitation Text
145573New CodeSee Bill Text
14582Amended CodeCitation Text
14595Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2329Amended CodeCitation Text
232966Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
2929192Amended CodeCitation Text
2929193New CodeSee Bill Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3305Amended CodeCitation Text
330507Amended CodeCitation Text
330508Amended CodeCitation Text
330512New CodeSee Bill Text
330520Amended CodeCitation Text
330522Amended CodeCitation Text
3307Amended CodeCitation Text
330720Amended CodeCitation Text
3307373New CodeSee Bill Text
330741Amended CodeCitation Text
330742Amended CodeCitation Text
3309Amended CodeCitation Text
330922Amended CodeCitation Text
330966Amended CodeCitation Text
3309661Amended CodeCitation Text
3309673New CodeSee Bill Text
330982Amended CodeCitation Text
330995Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4121Amended CodeCitation Text
412112Amended CodeCitation Text
4121123Amended CodeCitation Text
4121124Repealed CodeCitation Text
4121125Amended CodeCitation Text
412132Amended CodeCitation Text
412141Amended CodeCitation Text
412144Amended CodeCitation Text
412168Amended CodeCitation Text
412199Repealed CodeCitation Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
412335Amended CodeCitation Text
4123512Amended CodeCitation Text
412352Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5505Amended CodeCitation Text
550504Amended CodeCitation Text
550522Amended CodeCitation Text
5505263New CodeSee Bill Text
550534Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
742Amended CodeCitation Text
74241Amended CodeCitation Text
74246Amended CodeCitation Text
742464New CodeSee Bill Text
74247Amended CodeCitation Text
74264Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback