OH HB118 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 8 2012 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-09 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 149.43, 2903.01, 2903.11, 2903.12, 2903.13, 2903.21, and 2929.04 and to enact section 2903.23 of the Revised Code to provide that residential and familial information of a probation officer is not a public record, to increase the penalties for certain offenses when a judge, magistrate, or prosecutor is the victim, to prohibit a person from threatening a judge, magistrate, or prosecutor, and to make the killing of a judge, magistrate, or prosecutor an aggravating circumstance for the imposition of the death penalty for aggravated murder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide that residential and familial information of a probation officer is not a public record, to increase the penalties for certain offenses when a judge, magistrate, or prosecutor is the victim, to prohibit a person from threatening a judge, magistrate, or prosecutor, and to make the killing of a judge, magistrate, or prosecutor an aggravating circumstance for the imposition of the death penalty for aggravated murder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-08 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-09 To Judiciary
2012-05-09 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-08 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-01-25 Committee Report - S
2011-02-22 To Criminal Justice
2011-02-22 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2903Amended CodeCitation Text
290301Amended CodeCitation Text
290311Amended CodeCitation Text
290312Amended CodeCitation Text
290313Amended CodeCitation Text
290321Amended CodeCitation Text
290323New CodeSee Bill Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292904Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback