OH HB116 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2013-06-13 - To Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 4729.01, 4729.531, 4729.532, 4729.54, and 4729.55 and to enact sections 955.151, 959.134, 3719.091, 4729.533, 4729.534, 4729.535, 4729.542, 4729.991, and 4741.201 of the Revised Code to govern the chemical capture of animals and to make changes to the law governing euthanasia of an animal by lethal injection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To govern the chemical capture of animals and to make changes to the law governing euthanasia of an animal by lethal injection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-12 - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-13 To Agriculture
2013-06-13 Introduced to Senate
2013-06-12 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2013-06-04 Committee Report - S
2013-04-08 To Agriculture and Natural Resources
2013-04-08 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37New CodeSee Bill Text
3719New CodeSee Bill Text
3719091New CodeSee Bill Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4729Amended CodeCitation Text
472901Amended CodeCitation Text
4729531Amended CodeCitation Text
4729532Amended CodeCitation Text
4729533New CodeSee Bill Text
4729534New CodeSee Bill Text
4729535New CodeSee Bill Text
472954Amended CodeCitation Text
4729542New CodeSee Bill Text
472955Amended CodeCitation Text
4729991New CodeSee Bill Text
4741New CodeSee Bill Text
4741201New CodeSee Bill Text
9New CodeSee Bill Text
955New CodeSee Bill Text
955151New CodeSee Bill Text
959New CodeSee Bill Text
959134New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback