OH HB100 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 10 2007 - 100% progress
Action: 2007-09-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 102.02, 102.06, 109.981, 119.01, 131.02, 1707.01, 3345.12, 3923.41, 3923.44, 3923.47, 4121.01, 4121.12, 4121.121, 4121.122, 4121.123, 4121.125, 4121.126, 4121.128, 4121.37, 4121.441, 4121.48, 4121.61, 4121.67, 4121.70, 4123.25, 4123.29, 4123.291, 4123.311, 4123.32, 4123.34, 4123.341, 4123.342, 4123.35, 4123.351, 4123.37, 4123.411, 4123.44, 4123.441, 4123.47, 4123.50, 4123.511, 4123.512, 4123.66, 4123.80, 4123.82, 4123.92, 4125.05, 4127.07, 4127.08, 4131.04, 4131.06, 4131.13, 4131.14, 4131.16, 4167.02, 4167.07, 4167.08, 4167.09, 4167.11, and 4167.14; to enact sections 121.52, 3923.43, 3923.441, 3923.442, 3923.443, 3923.444, 4121.129, 4121.75 to 4121.79, 4123.321, and 4123.442; to repeal section 4121.06 of the Revised Code; to amend Section 4 of Am. Sub. H.B. 516 of the 125th General Assembly, as subsequently amended; and to amend Section 3 of Am. H.B. 67 of the 126th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to abolish the Workers' Compensation Oversight Commission, the Internal Security Committee, and the Services Committee of the Workers' Compensation System; to create the Workers' Compensation Council, Bureau of Workers' Compensation Board of Directors, and specified working committees, to transfer the powers and duties of the Oversight Commission to the Board and the working committees, to make other changes in the Workers' Compensation Law, to make appropriations for the Bureau of Workers' Compensation and the Industrial Commission for the biennium beginning July 1, 2007, and ending June 30, 2009, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of the Bureau's and the Commission's programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

; to amend Section 4 of Am. Sub. H.B. 516 of the 125th General Assembly, as subsequently amended; and to amend Section 3 of Am. H.B. 67 of the 126th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to abolish the Workers' Compensation Oversight Commission, the Internal Security Committee, and the Services Committee of the Workers' Compensation System; to create the Workers' Compensation Council, Bureau of Workers' Compensation Board of Directors, and specified working committees, to transfer the powers and duties of the Oversight Commission to the Board and the working committees, to make other changes in the Workers' Compensation Law, to make appropriations for the Bureau of Workers' Compensation and the Industrial Commission for the biennium beginning July 1, 2007, and ending June 30, 2009, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of the Bureau's and the Commission's programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2007-09-10 Effective Date
2007-06-11 Governor Action
2007-06-11 End of 10-day Period
2007-05-30 Sent to Governor
2007-05-23 Concurrence
2007-05-22 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2007-05-22 Committee Report
2007-04-26 To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
2007-04-26 Introduced to Senate
2007-04-25 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2007-04-25 Committee Report
2007-03-06 To Insurance
2007-03-06 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
102Amended CodeCitation Text
10202Amended CodeCitation Text
10206Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
109981Amended CodeCitation Text
119Amended CodeCitation Text
11901Amended CodeCitation Text
121New CodeSee Bill Text
12152New CodeSee Bill Text
131Amended CodeCitation Text
13102Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1707Amended CodeCitation Text
170701Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3345Amended CodeCitation Text
334512Amended CodeCitation Text
39Amended CodeCitation Text
3923Amended CodeCitation Text
392341Amended CodeCitation Text
392343New CodeSee Bill Text
392344Amended CodeCitation Text
3923441New CodeSee Bill Text
3923442New CodeSee Bill Text
3923443New CodeSee Bill Text
3923444New CodeSee Bill Text
392347Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4121Amended CodeCitation Text
412101Amended CodeCitation Text
412106Repealed CodeCitation Text
412112Amended CodeCitation Text
4121121Amended CodeCitation Text
4121122Amended CodeCitation Text
4121123Amended CodeCitation Text
4121125Amended CodeCitation Text
4121126Amended CodeCitation Text
4121128Amended CodeCitation Text
4121129New CodeSee Bill Text
412137Amended CodeCitation Text
4121441Amended CodeCitation Text
412148Amended CodeCitation Text
412161Amended CodeCitation Text
412167Amended CodeCitation Text
412170Amended CodeCitation Text
412175New CodeSee Bill Text
412176New CodeSee Bill Text
412177New CodeSee Bill Text
412178New CodeSee Bill Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
412325Amended CodeCitation Text
412329Amended CodeCitation Text
4123291Amended CodeCitation Text
4123311Amended CodeCitation Text
412332Amended CodeCitation Text
4123321New CodeSee Bill Text
412334Amended CodeCitation Text
4123341Amended CodeCitation Text
4123342Amended CodeCitation Text
412335Amended CodeCitation Text
4123351Amended CodeCitation Text
412337Amended CodeCitation Text
4123411Amended CodeCitation Text
412344Amended CodeCitation Text
4123441Amended CodeCitation Text
4123442New CodeSee Bill Text
412347Amended CodeCitation Text
412350Amended CodeCitation Text
4123511Amended CodeCitation Text
4123512Amended CodeCitation Text
412366Amended CodeCitation Text
412380Amended CodeCitation Text
412382Amended CodeCitation Text
412392Amended CodeCitation Text
4125Amended CodeCitation Text
412505Amended CodeCitation Text
4127Amended CodeCitation Text
412707Amended CodeCitation Text
412708Amended CodeCitation Text
4131Amended CodeCitation Text
413104Amended CodeCitation Text
413106Amended CodeCitation Text
413113Amended CodeCitation Text
413114Amended CodeCitation Text
413116Amended CodeCitation Text
4167Amended CodeCitation Text
416702Amended CodeCitation Text
416707Amended CodeCitation Text
416708Amended CodeCitation Text
416709Amended CodeCitation Text
416711Amended CodeCitation Text
416714Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback