OH HB10 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3.16, 101.35, 103.0511, 106.02, 106.022, 106.023, 106.031, 106.05, 119.03, 121.83, 135.02, 305.03, 319.04, 319.26, 321.37, 321.46, 507.02, 2921.13, 2921.44, 3314.023, 5101.09, and 5713.012; to enact sections 117.45, 507.12, 507.13, 733.78, 733.81, 3313.30, 3314.50, 3326.211, 3328.16, and 3328.37; and to repeal sections 319.25 and 321.38 of the Revised Code; to amend Section 267.50.70 of Am. Sub. H.B. 153 of the 129th General Assembly; and to amend Section 267.50.70 of Am. Sub. H.B. 153 of the 129th General Assembly for the purpose of codifying it as section 3314.51 of the Revised Code to establish initial education programs and continuing education requirements for the fiscal officers of townships and municipal corporations, to establish procedures for removing those officers, county treasurers, and county auditors from office, to create fiscal accountability requirements for counties, townships, municipal corporations, and public schools, to revise the procedure for appointing an interim replacement official to perform the duties of a suspended elected county official, to authorize the board of county commissioners to appoint an acting officer to perform such suspended official's duties before an interim replacement official is appointed to reduce the required number of Board of Deposit meetings, to provide procedures to request additional meetings, and to require web site postings of specified Board of Deposit notices, to modify the continuing education requirements for qualified mass appraisal project managers, and to correct provisions recently enacted by S.B. 3 of the 130th General Assembly.
Title
To establish initial education programs and continuing education requirements for the fiscal officers of townships and municipal corporations, to establish procedures for removing those officers, county treasurers, and county auditors from office, to create fiscal accountability requirements for counties, townships, municipal corporations, and public schools, to revise the procedure for appointing an interim replacement official to perform the duties of a suspended elected county official, to authorize the board of county commissioners to appoint an acting officer to perform such suspended official's duties before an interim replacement official is appointed to reduce the required number of Board of Deposit meetings, to provide procedures to request additional meetings, and to require web site postings of specified Board of Deposit notices, to modify the continuing education requirements for qualified mass appraisal project managers, and to correct provisions recently enacted by S.B. 3 of the 130th General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-09 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-09 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-04 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-06-09 | To Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs | |
2014-06-09 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-06-04 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-01-30 | To State and Local Government | |
2013-01-30 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 01 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 03 | 0511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 06 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 06 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 06 | 023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 06 | 031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 06 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 17 | 411 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 17 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 19 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 21 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 35 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 21 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 21 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 05 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 19 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 19 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
3 | 19 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 21 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 21 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 21 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 13 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 26 | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 28 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 28 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
5 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 07 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 07 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 07 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 07 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 01 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 13 | 012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
7 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
7 | 33 | 78 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 33 | 81 | New Code | See Bill Text |