NY S07374 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transitional care.
Title
Relates to transitional care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.13 |
2014-11-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.478 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.565 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9729 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1541 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09729 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7374