NY S07347 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Buffalo school district to require minors five years of age to attend kindergarten.
Title
Authorizes the Buffalo school district to require minors five years of age to attend kindergarten.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.189 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.423 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a10002 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1036 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10002 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7347