NY S07262 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.424
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.424
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school nurses to possess and administer epinephrine auto-injectors in the event of an emergency.
Title
Authorizes school nurses to possess and administer epinephrine auto-injectors in the event of an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.424 |
2014-10-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.545 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7791a |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.874 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7262A |
2014-05-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2014-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07791 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7262a