NY S07236 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the NYS Triangle Shirtwaist fire 100th anniversary commemoration commission to focus attention upon the 100th anniversary of the Triangle Shirtwaist Fire on March 25, 2011.
Title
Establishes the NYS Triangle Shirtwaist fire 100th anniversary commemoration commission to focus attention upon the 100th anniversary of the Triangle Shirtwaist Fire on March 25, 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | referred to governmental operations | |
2010-06-16 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-16 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1020 | |
2010-06-15 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-03-25 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10717 (Same As) 2010-04-16 - referred to governmental operations