NY S07111 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.393
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.393
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides authorized leave for volunteer fire department members or volunteer ambulance squad members for states of emergency; deems leave is excused when a state of emergency is declared by the federal or state government and such person is engaged in the actual performance of his or her duties as an emergency responder; provides such period of leave shall not be charged against any other leave to which the employee is entitled; allows the employer to request a statement from the department or service stating the period of time the employee responded to the state of emergency.
Title
Provides authorized leave for volunteer fire department members or volunteer ambulance squad members for states of emergency; deems leave is excused when a state of emergency is declared by the federal or state government and such person is engaged in the actual performance of his or her duties as an emergency responder; provides such period of leave shall not be charged against any other leave to which the employee is entitled; allows the employer to request a statement from the department or service stating the period of time the employee responded to the state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.393 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.330 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9849a |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1269 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7111B |
2014-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2014-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7111A |
2014-05-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2014-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09849 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7111b