NY S07075 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8972
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8972
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a party that files papers in connection with a motion need not include copies of papers that were filed previously electronically with the court, but may make reference to them.
Title
Provides that a party that files papers in connection with a motion need not include copies of papers that were filed previously electronically with the court, but may make reference to them.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8972 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.425 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08972 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - signed chap.109