NY S07030 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the process for the imposition and collection of real property taxes within the county of Onondaga; relates to the adoption of the abstract of taxes for the city of Syracuse as part of the budget process for the county of Onondaga; relates to the date by which the county of Onondaga presents to the city of Syracuse the annual taxes to be imposed upon the real and personal property within the city.
Title
Relates to the process for the imposition and collection of real property taxes within the county of Onondaga; relates to the adoption of the abstract of taxes for the city of Syracuse as part of the budget process for the county of Onondaga; relates to the date by which the county of Onondaga presents to the city of Syracuse the annual taxes to be imposed upon the real and personal property within the city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.390 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9345 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1122 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09345 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7030