NY S07009 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires training of fire officers in a city with a population of one million or more; requires field training and classroom instruction in the fire and building codes and any relevant local ordinances of such city by July 1, 2015.
Title
Requires training of fire officers in a city with a population of one million or more; requires field training and classroom instruction in the fire and building codes and any relevant local ordinances of such city by July 1, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.521 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.607 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9573 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.549 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09573 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7009