NY S06992 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to driving while using a portable electronic device; removes the requirement that there be reasonable cause a person using the device has committed a violation to issue a summons.
Title
Relates to driving while using a portable electronic device; removes the requirement that there be reasonable cause a person using the device has committed a violation to issue a summons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-05-05 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-05-04 | 1ST REPORT CAL.498 | |
2010-03-23 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-03-04 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10063 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - REFERRED TO RULES