NY S06977 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.158
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.158
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to refunding bonds and extending the provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to refunding bonds and extending the provisions thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.158 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.655 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | substituted for a9034 |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.452 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09034 (Same As) 2014-05-13 - substituted by s6977