NY S06830 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state to cede concurrent jurisdiction to the federal government over the Stony Lonesome and range areas at the West Point Military Reservation.
Title
Authorizes the state to cede concurrent jurisdiction to the federal government over the Stony Lonesome and range areas at the West Point Military Reservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.11 |
2014-11-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.476 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.206 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a9595 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.974 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6830A |
2014-04-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09595 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - substituted by s6830a