NY S06799 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, undersheriffs and correction officers in Westchester county 75% disability benefits for injuries sustained in the performance of duties that are a result of an intentional or reckless act of any civilian visiting or otherwise present at a correctional institution.
Title
Provides sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, undersheriffs and correction officers in Westchester county 75% disability benefits for injuries sustained in the performance of duties that are a result of an intentional or reckless act of any civilian visiting or otherwise present at a correctional institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.521 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.551 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9045 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1513 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09045 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6799