NY S05950 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.516
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.516
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including probation officers with respect to the confidentiality of personnel records of police officers, firefighters and correction officers.
Title
Relates to including probation officers with respect to the confidentiality of personnel records of police officers, firefighters and correction officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.516 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a8192a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5950A |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.760 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-10-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08192 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - substituted by s5950a