NY S05867 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on January 10 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-01-10 - APPROVAL MEMO.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "New York State Commercial Goods Transportation Industry Fair Play Act"; redefines the definition of "employee".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "New York State Commercial Goods Transportation Industry Fair Play Act"; redefines the definition of "employee".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-21 - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-10AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.20
2014-01-10AssemblySIGNED CHAP.558
2013-12-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2013-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2013-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2013-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.627
2013-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a5237b
2013-06-21Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2013-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1569
2013-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A05237 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5867

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback