NY S05372 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.380
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.380
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a form for an affirmation by any person in a civil action.
Title
Provides a form for an affirmation by any person in a civil action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.380 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.218 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a9762 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.521 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5372A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09762 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - substituted by s5372a