NY S05160 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-20 - SIGNED CHAP.403
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-20 - SIGNED CHAP.403
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals certain provisions of law relating to urban renewal agencies and industrial development agencies and transfers remaining rights to the municipality for whose purpose the agency was created.
Title
Repeals certain provisions of law relating to urban renewal agencies and industrial development agencies and transfers remaining rights to the municipality for whose purpose the agency was created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.403 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.339 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9968 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5160B |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.441 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5160A |
2014-04-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09968 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s5160b