NY S05153 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.559
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.559
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a performance of duty disability to Suffolk county probation officers.
Title
Provides a performance of duty disability to Suffolk county probation officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.559 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.546 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8160a |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.788 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5153A |
2014-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08160 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s5153a