NY S04912 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-21 - PRINT NUMBER 4912A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-21 - PRINT NUMBER 4912A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for and regulates the operation and testing of motor vehicles with autonomous technology.
Title
Provides for and regulates the operation and testing of motor vehicles with autonomous technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4912A |
2014-04-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07391 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - print number 7391a