NY S04714 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides up to three years of service credit to members of public retirement systems of the state for military service rendered during times of peace; removes requirement that such military service occur during specified periods of hostilities; such members must have at least five years of credited service, not including military service; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Provides up to three years of service credit to members of public retirement systems of the state for military service rendered during times of peace; removes requirement that such military service occur during specified periods of hostilities; such members must have at least five years of credited service, not including military service; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1247 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-02-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4714A |
2014-02-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06974 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7839