NY S03894 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.515
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.515
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates, as peace officers, special deputy sheriffs of the county of Chautauqua within the grounds of and properties owned by the Chautauqua Institution.
Title
Designates, as peace officers, special deputy sheriffs of the county of Chautauqua within the grounds of and properties owned by the Chautauqua Institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.515 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.442 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6937a |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3894B |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.581 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.610 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3894A |
2013-03-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2013-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |