NY S03332 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a deduction against personal gross income in an amount equal to fees, costs and expenses paid or incurred including legal fees and agency costs in connection with the adoption of a child.
Title
Provides for a deduction against personal gross income in an amount equal to fees, costs and expenses paid or incurred including legal fees and agency costs in connection with the adoption of a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |