NY S03250 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3250A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3250A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an instant runoff voting method for certain local elections for races with three or more candidates; insures majority support for elected officers; provides for repeal of such provisions.
Title
Establishes an instant runoff voting method for certain local elections for races with three or more candidates; insures majority support for elected officers; provides for repeal of such provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3250A |
2014-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2013-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02109 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - print number 2109a