NY S03149 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-15 - SIGNED CHAP.19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote; creates a compact between the states and the District of Columbia; defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote; creates a compact between the states and the District of Columbia; defines terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-15AssemblySIGNED CHAP.19
2014-04-14SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-03-25Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-03-25Assemblypassed assembly
2014-03-25Assemblysubstituted for a4422a
2014-03-25Assemblyreferred to election law
2014-03-25SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-03-25SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-03-18SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3149A
2014-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-02-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-02-10Senate1ST REPORT CAL.152
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2013-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2013-04-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-04-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-04-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.368
2013-01-30SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04422 (Same As) 2014-03-25 - substituted by s3149a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback