NY S02852 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 2852A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 2852A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the provision of voter registration forms to students by colleges, universities and public school districts; authorizes the pre-registration to vote of 16 year olds.
Title
Provides for the provision of voter registration forms to students by colleges, universities and public school districts; authorizes the pre-registration to vote of 16 year olds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2852A |
2014-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2013-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02107 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - print number 2107a