NY S02852 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 2852A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the provision of voter registration forms to students by colleges, universities and public school districts; authorizes the pre-registration to vote of 16 year olds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the provision of voter registration forms to students by colleges, universities and public school districts; authorizes the pre-registration to vote of 16 year olds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 2852A
2014-02-06SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2013-01-24SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02107 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - print number 2107a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback