NY S02679 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and empowers the College Retirement Equities Fund (CREF) to merge with the Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association (TIAA) with CREF ceasing to be a corporate entity and TIAA as the surviving entity.
Title
Authorizes and empowers the College Retirement Equities Fund (CREF) to merge with the Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association (TIAA) with CREF ceasing to be a corporate entity and TIAA as the surviving entity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.171 |
2023-06-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.825 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a6347b |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2679B |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1180 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2679A |
2023-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06347 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s2679b