NY S02028 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans the sale, use or possession of 50-caliber or larger weapons and directs the division of state police to embark on a program whereby persons currently in lawful possession of such weapons may be reimbursed for the fair market value thereof upon turning such weapons in to a designated officer.
Title
Bans the sale, use or possession of 50-caliber or larger weapons and directs the division of state police to embark on a program whereby persons currently in lawful possession of such weapons may be reimbursed for the fair market value thereof upon turning such weapons in to a designated officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Squadron [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-02-28 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03322 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - print number 3322a