NY S01998 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "clerical error".
Title
Expands the definition of "clerical error".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.409 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.671 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a1445 |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.878 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1044 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01445 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - substituted by s1998