NY S01982 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful surveillance in the second degree and dissemination of an unlawful surveillance image in the first and second degrees.
Title
Relates to unlawful surveillance in the second degree and dissemination of an unlawful surveillance image in the first and second degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.193 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.793 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a2053c |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1982C |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 1982B |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.750 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1982A |
2014-02-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.631 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02053 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s1982c