NY S01507 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing penalties for first degree stalking to a class C felony, second degree stalking to a class D felony, third degree stalking to a class E felony, and fourth degree stalking to a class A misdemeanor.
Title
Relates to increasing penalties for first degree stalking to a class C felony, second degree stalking to a class D felony, third degree stalking to a class E felony, and fourth degree stalking to a class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.461 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1507A |
2014-04-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-03-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.123 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |