NY S01353 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for notice by commissioner of correctional services of availability of medical, educational and other services, including alcohol and substance abuse treatment, to prisoners upon their release from state prison.
Title
Provides for notice by commissioner of correctional services of availability of medical, educational and other services, including alcohol and substance abuse treatment, to prisoners upon their release from state prison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.22 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.506 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.449 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a231 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2014-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.482 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00231 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - substituted by s1353