NY S00804 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 804A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 804A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts energy efficiency standards for televisions; amends definition of television and adds other, related definitions.
Title
Enacts energy efficiency standards for televisions; amends definition of television and adds other, related definitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 804A |
2014-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02182 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.466