NY S00341 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires open space conservation projects to be undertaken with willing sellers; provides that the use of eminent domain for such projects shall be limited to lands where the owner thereof has consented thereto or where the eminent domain is required to quiet title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires open space conservation projects to be undertaken with willing sellers; provides that the use of eminent domain for such projects shall be limited to lands where the owner thereof has consented thereto or where the eminent domain is required to quiet title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-20 - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-17Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2012-04-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-04-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-03-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-03-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-03-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.381
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2012-01-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-01-04Assemblydied in assembly
2011-06-20Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2011-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-05-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2011-05-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2011-05-10Senate1ST REPORT CAL.570
2011-01-05SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A00147 (Same As) 2012-05-23 - held for consideration in environmental conservation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback