NY S00089 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the creation of a uniform system for the issuance of identification cards for retired members of the state police.
Title
Provides for the creation of a uniform system for the issuance of identification cards for retired members of the state police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.9 |
2014-11-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.474 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.599 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7221a |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1194 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 89A |
2013-06-18 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1214 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07221 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s89a