NY A11177 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Introduced on May 24 2010 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - substituted by s7945a

Summary

Prohibits the electronic recording of certain information identifying information of a person subjected to temporary questioning or search in a public place by police officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the electronic recording of certain information identifying information of a person subjected to temporary questioning or search in a public place by police officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-29 substituted by s7945a
2010-06-17 amended on third reading (t) 11177a
2010-06-14 ordered to third reading rules cal.113
2010-06-14 rules report cal.113
2010-06-14 reported
2010-06-03 reported referred to rules
2010-05-24 referred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S07945 (Same As) 2010-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.176

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback