NY A10094 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the siting of certain premises licensed to sell liquor for consumption on the premises.
Title
Relates to the siting of certain premises licensed to sell liquor for consumption on the premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.457 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1654 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7837 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.429 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.429 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-06-13 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07837 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10094