NY A09933 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to revising and modernizing the uniform commercial code; makes significant amendments and revisions to articles 1, 7 and 9; makes conforming amendments.
Title
Relates to revising and modernizing the uniform commercial code; makes significant amendments and revisions to articles 1, 7 and 9; makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.505 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1651 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7816 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.419 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.419 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07816 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9933