NY A09926 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring petroleum bulk storage facilities to provide a surety to be used in the case of a necessary cleanup and decontamination.
Title
Relates to requiring petroleum bulk storage facilities to provide a surety to be used in the case of a necessary cleanup and decontamination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.232 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.232 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07718 (Same As) 2014-06-02 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION