NY A09843 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates uniformed court officers of the town of New Windsor as peace officers.
Title
Designates uniformed court officers of the town of New Windsor as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.508 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1522 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7787 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.328 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.328 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07787 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9843