NY A09834 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to civil liability of vehicle owners for traffic control signal violations.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to civil liability of vehicle owners for traffic control signal violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.134 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1569 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7703 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.494 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.494 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07703 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9834