NY A09737 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.127
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.127
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to adjudications and owner liability for a violation of traffic-control signal indications in Suffolk county.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to adjudications and owner liability for a violation of traffic-control signal indications in Suffolk county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.127 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1100 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7648 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.488 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.488 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | print number 9737a |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07648 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9737A